Heimann v. No Named Respondent
Petitioner: Darrick Heimann
Respondent: No Named Respondent
Case Number: 1:2021cv02716
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #4 Order of Dismissal on 11/19/2021. (athom, )
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Applicant failed to prosecute and cure the deficiencies as directed. IFP on appeal is denied without prejudice. No certificate of appealability will issue. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/19/2021. (athom, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Applicant files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/8/2021. (evana, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (mbrow, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 LETTER by Petitioner Darrick Heimann. (mbrow, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heimann v. No Named Respondent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrick Heimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: No Named Respondent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?