Hercules Industries, Inc v. Yogapipe, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hercules Industries and Hercules Industries, Inc
Defendant: Yogapipe Inc and Yogapipe, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv02719
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bw
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Hercules Industries, Inc. (Scherer, James)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Hercules Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order of Consolidation)(Scherer, James)
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frank Christopher Porada on behalf of Yogapipe, IncAttorney Frank Christopher Porada added to party Yogapipe, Inc(pty:dft) (Porada, Frank)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hercules Industries, Inc. Yogapipe, Inc waiver sent on 10/20/2021, answer due 12/19/2021. (Scherer, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12 October 2021. Consent Form due by 12/23/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/30/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #9 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneys David B. Law & James F. Scherer. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of David B. Law by James F. Scherer on behalf of Hercules Industries (Scherer, James)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #6 Order of Recusal, this case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-2719 NRN. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/8/2021. (evana, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Yogapipe Inc. by Plaintiff Hercules Industries. (Scherer, James)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has been improperly signed. Summonses may only be issued by the Clerk's Office. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (mbrow, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (mbrow, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yogapipe Inc (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8117081)Attorney James F. Scherer added to party Hercules Industries(pty:pla), filed by Hercules Industries. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Scherer, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hercules Industries, Inc v. Yogapipe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hercules Industries
Represented By: James F. Scherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hercules Industries, Inc
Represented By: David B. Law
Represented By: James F. Scherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yogapipe Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yogapipe, Inc
Represented By: Frank Christopher Porada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?