Landau v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Landau
Defendant: Commissioner, of Social Security Administration and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2021cv02834
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Public Entry for Level 1 Restricted Document #7 ). Text Only Entry (athom, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration.. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document, #8 Continuation of Main Document, #9 Continuation of Main Document, #10 Continuation of Main Document, #11 Continuation of Main Document, #12 Continuation of Main Document, #13 Continuation of Main Document, #14 Continuation of Main Document, #15 Continuation of Main Document, #16 Continuation of Main Document, #17 Continuation of Main Document, #18 Continuation of Main Document)(Pedderson, Danielle)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: #1 Complaint, filed by Michael Landau. Opening and response briefs shall be limited to no more than twenty (20) pages. Reply briefs shall be limited to no more than ten (10) pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/22/2021. (athom, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, of Social Security Administration answer due 12/20/2021. Text Only Entry (athom, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jcharl, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8136372)Attorney Jeffrey M. Flynn added to party Michael Landau (pty:pla), filed by Michael Landau. (Attachments: #1 order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flynn, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landau v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Landau
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?