Soto v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Soto
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2021cv02906
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Lisa A. Soto.. (Seckar, Michael) Modified on 12/17/2021 to add title (sdunb, ).
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Public Entry for Restricted Document 6 filed on 12/09/2021). Text Only Entry. (sdunb, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration.. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document)(Pedderson, Danielle)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Utility Setting Answer Deadline: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 12/28/2021. Text Only Entry. (sdunb, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8152279)Attorney Michael W. Seckar added to party Lisa A Soto(pty:pla), filed by Lisa A Soto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seckar, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Soto
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?