SEBO America, LLC v. Does 1-10
Plaintiff: SEBO America, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv02916
Filed: October 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The hearing scheduled for November 29, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. is VACATED. Plaintiff shall file proof of service on named Defendants before any renewal of its motion for a temporary restraining order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/23/2021. (sdunb, )
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF LEAVE TO SEEK THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY (Dkt. #9 ) by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 November 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion for and Brief in Support of Leave to Seek Third Party Discovery to Learn Defendants' Identities (Dkt. #9) is GRANTED. Prior to the Rule 26(f) conference, SEBO may serve third-party subpoena(s) pursuant to Rule 45 on Amazon, Inc. or other appropriate Amazon legal entity for the limited purpose of ascertaining the true identities of the Doe defendants.It is FURTHER ORDERED that on or before January 15, 2022, SEBO shall file aStatus Report updating the Court on the progress of identifying the Doe defendants. If SEBO requires additional time or additional discovery, it shall concurrently move for such relief.(cmadr, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 PAYMENT RECEIVED from SEBO America, LLC in the amount of $ 5,000.00 pursuant to #14 Order; Receipt Number COX101176. (sdunb, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC. This order shall remain in full force and effect pending hearing and determination of an application for a preliminary injunction or the expiration of fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, whichever comes first. This Court will hold a hearing for resolution on the Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction on November 29, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom A601 on the Sixth Floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado before Judge Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/15/2021.(sdunb, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to Seek Third Party Discovery to Learn Defendant's Identities filed by SEBO America, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/9/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/9/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/9/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to the filing of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02916-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Seek Third Party Discovery to Learn Defendant's Identities by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sturman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1 November 2021. Consent Form due by 1/25/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC (Sturman, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 - 10 (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8153633)Attorney Jeffrey Michael Sturman added to party SEBO America, LLC(pty:pla), filed by SEBO America, LLC.(Sturman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEBO America, LLC v. Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEBO America, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Sturman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?