Cyph, Inc. v. Zoom Communication, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cyph, Inc.
Defendant: Zoom Communication, Inc. and Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03027
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Cyph, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Brundidge, Carl)
December 27, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Jones, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Saulsbury, Timothy)
December 9, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raghu Rao, #2 Declaration of Andrew Jones, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Saulsbury, Timothy)
November 30, 2021 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Carl I. Brundidge. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. *** The filer is missing an electronic s/signature. Please include to all future documents. *** (Text Only Entry) (sdunb, )
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/24/2021. For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #14 is granted. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before December 27, 2021.(cpomm, )
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Zoom Video Communications, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/24/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Saulsbury, Timothy)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew T. Jones on behalf of Zoom Video Communications, Inc.Attorney Andrew T. Jones added to party Zoom Video Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, Andrew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy C. Saulsbury on behalf of Zoom Video Communications, Inc.Attorney Timothy C. Saulsbury added to party Zoom Video Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Saulsbury, Timothy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carl Irwin Brundidge on behalf of Cyph, Inc.Attorney Carl Irwin Brundidge added to party Cyph, Inc.(pty:pla) (Brundidge, Carl)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on November 12, 2021. Pursuant to the Order of Reference, this Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on January 19, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the parties and any unrepresented non-prisoner parties in this case are to hold a meeting in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before January 5, 2021 and jointly prepare a proposed Scheduling Order. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d), only requests pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 34 may be submitted before the Rule 26(f) meeting, unless otherwise ordered or directed by the Court. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A), responses to such discovery requests must be submitted no later than 30 days after the Rule 26(f) meeting, unless the parties stipulate or the Court orders otherwise. (csarr, )
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/10/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/10/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jcharl, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: David E. Moore. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (jcharl, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Moore, David)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Zoom Communications, Inc. by Plaintiff Cyph, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, David)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8169740)Attorney David Evan Moore added to party Cyph, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Cyph, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Moore, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyph, Inc. v. Zoom Communication, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyph, Inc.
Represented By: David Evan Moore
Represented By: Carl Irwin Brundidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoom Communication, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew T. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Saulsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?