Vianez v. Denver Courts et al
Plaintiff: Juan Vianez
Defendant: Denver Courts, Mayor, Gov. of Colorado Denver and Warden
Case Number: 1:2021cv03125
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 USCA Case Number 21-1435 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Vianez. (sdunb, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Vianez to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record, #2 Docket Sheet)(sdunb, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order Dismissing Case, by Plaintiff Juan Vianez. (Attachments: #1 Letter Re: Misdirected NOA)(sdunb, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER CLOSING ACTION. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court close this action because Mr. Vianez has failed to comply with the filing restrictions set forth in Vianez v. United States, No. 14-cv-01363-LTB, ECF No. 7 (D. Colo. July 1, 2014). It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/23/2021. (sdunb, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 LETTER by Plaintiff Juan Vianez. (jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vianez v. Denver Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Vianez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. of Colorado Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?