Arnold v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Y. Arnold and Joyce Arnold
Defendant: Jozetta Martinez, Renaissance North Colorado Station, Colorado Coalition for the Homeless, US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Volunteers of America Sunset Housing, LP and Mark N. Tschetter
Case Number: 1:2021cv03217
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/18/2022. Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. #9 ) requesting an extension of time is GRANTED and Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 10, 2022, to file an amended complaint. (agarc, )
January 13, 2022 Filing 9 Letter by Plaintiff Joyce Y. Arnold. (athom, )
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. If Ms. Arnold fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/08/2021. (athom, )
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #6 ) is GRANTED. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/07/2021. (athom, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Joyce Y. Arnold. (athom, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Colorado Coalition for the Homeless, Mark N. Tschetter, US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Volunteers of America Sunset Housing, LP, filed by Joyce Y. Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses) (athom, )
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/01/2021. (athom, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Joyce Y. Arnold. (cpomm, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 LETTER Re: Discrimination by Plaintiff Joyce Y. Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Service Agreement, #10 Supporter list)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Y. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jozetta Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance North Colorado Station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Coalition for the Homeless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volunteers of America Sunset Housing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark N. Tschetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?