Egoscue, Inc. v. Pain Free Posture Therapy LLC et al
Plaintiff: Egoscue, Inc.
Defendant: Pain Free Posture Therapy LLC and Anu Lawrence
Case Number: 1:2021cv03282
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a completed Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #[4-2]) shall be filed no later than seven calendar days before the conference.At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/18/2022. Text Only Entry (amont, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Egoscue, Inc.. Anu Lawrence waiver sent on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022. (McKellogg, R.)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Egoscue, Inc.. Pain Free Posture Therapy LLC waiver sent on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022. (McKellogg, R.)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (norlin, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: R. Keith McKellogg.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, Anu Lawrence, Pain Free Posture Therapy LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8211914)Attorney R. Keith McKellogg added to party Egoscue, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Egoscue, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, 4 and 5, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKellogg, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Egoscue, Inc. v. Pain Free Posture Therapy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Egoscue, Inc.
Represented By: R. Keith McKellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Free Posture Therapy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anu Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?