Otter Products, LLC v. Flygrip, Inc.
Plaintiff: Otter Products, LLC
Defendant: Flygrip, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03298
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Otter Products, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Sayres, Joel)
February 1, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay discovery and vacate deadlines pending the Court's decision on Flygrip's pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 16) by Defendant Flygrip, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in PopSockets v Flygrip, #2 Exhibit B - Order granting Flygrip's Motion to Stay in PopSockets v Flygrip case)(Katz, Robert)
January 31, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer, MOTION to Transfer Case , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Flygrip, Inc.. (Katz, Robert)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/26/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #14 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for February 16, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to March 4, 2022,1 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401 of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than February 25, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff shall call the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, from a land line at the time of the Scheduling Conference. (alave, )
January 22, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference Date and to Request Appearance by Telephone by Defendant Flygrip, Inc.. (Katz, Robert) Modified on 1/31/2022 pursuant to Minute Order #15 . (alave, ).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/22/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond #11 is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint no later than February 3, 2022.(alave, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Katz, Robert)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Flygrip, Inc.. (Katz, Robert)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Otter Products, LLC. Flygrip, Inc. served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Sayres, Joel)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/14/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/9/2022. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 2/16/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5-1] is February 2, 2022. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/14/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Otter Products, LLC (Sayres, Joel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (norlin, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Blue Ocean Enterprises, Inc. for Otter Products, LLC. (Sayres, Joel)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT against Flygrip, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8215590)Attorney Joel David Sayres added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Otter Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons)(Sayres, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otter Products, LLC v. Flygrip, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otter Products, LLC
Represented By: Joel David Sayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flygrip, Inc.
Represented By: Robert David Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?