Snowdance, LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Snowdance LLC
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv03329
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bw
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Scott Ponzi on behalf of AmGuard Insurance CompanyAttorney Matthew Scott Ponzi added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ponzi, Matthew)
February 10, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant AmGuard Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Swanson, Steven)
February 10, 2022 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant AmGuard Insurance Company. (Swanson, Steven)
February 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven Carl Swanson on behalf of AmGuard Insurance CompanyAttorney Steven Carl Swanson added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Swanson, Steven)
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Harshman Harrison. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Harshman Harrison on behalf of Snowdance LLCAttorney Michael Harshman Harrison added to party Snowdance LLC(pty:pla) (Harrison, Michael)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent WestGuard Insurance Company, Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company for AmGuard Insurance Company. (DiCanio, Michael)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint Attorney Michael Nicholas DiCanio added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft) by AmGuard Insurance Company.(DiCanio, Michael)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 2-17-2022 at 11:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, 7 days before the Telephonic Scheduling Conference (on or before 2-10-2022). The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#7] is due 2-10-2022. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12-14-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/13/21. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jcharl, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Re Rule 121 Duty to Confer by Mark D. Thompson, Chief District Court Judge, Summit County on 10/20/2021. (jcharl, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER for Discovery Protocol by Mark D. Thompson, Chief District Court Judge, Summit County on 10/20/2021. (jcharl, ) Modified to correct text on 12/13/2021 (jcharl, ).
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 First Amended Complaint against AmGuard Insurance Company, filed by Snowdance LLC.(jcharl, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmGuard Insurance Company from District COurt, Summit County, Colorado, Case Number 2021CV30123. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8221587), filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - First Amended Summons, #4 Exhibit C - First Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit E - Order for Discovery Protocol, #7 Exhibit F - Order re Rule 121 Duty to Confer, #8 Exhibit G - Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit H - Notice of Notice of Removal)(Montague, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowdance, LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snowdance LLC
Represented By: Michael Harshman Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Montague
Represented By: Matthew Scott Ponzi
Represented By: Michael Nicholas DiCanio
Represented By: Steven Carl Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?