Nicolls et al v. USA
Plaintiff: C. Robert Nicolls and Kathleen M. Nicolls
Defendant: United States of America and USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv03331
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 26 January 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadlines (Dkt. #8 ) is GRANTED as follows. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) on or before April 15, 2022. It is further ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for March 17, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to May 17, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before May 10, 2022. It is further ORDERED that the consent deadline is RESET to May 3, 2022. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #1 Complaint, #5 Order,, #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA by Defendant United States of America. (Valdman, Rika)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon (Fehringer, Briana)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States of America served on 12/16/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (Fehringer, Briana)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 14 December 2021. Consent Form due by 3/3/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/10/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Briana Jo Fehringer.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8221987)Attorney Briana Jo Fehringer added to party C. Robert Nicolls(pty:pla), Attorney Briana Jo Fehringer added to party Kathleen M Nicolls(pty:pla), filed by C. Robert Nicolls, Kathleen M Nicolls. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fehringer, Briana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicolls et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Robert Nicolls
Represented By: Briana J. Fehringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M. Nicolls
Represented By: Briana J. Fehringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?