M Welles and Associates, Inc. v. Edwell, Inc.
Plaintiff: M Welles and Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Edwell, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03342
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 19 January 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Stipulation to Extend Time (Dkt. #9 ),which the Court treats as a motion, is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before February 18, 2022. Future requests for extension of time shall contain a certification that the motionor stipulation was contemporaneously served by counsel on his or her client pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c). PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Plaintiff M Welles and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rozier, Carey)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4 January 2022. Consent Form due by 3/16/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/23/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M Welles and Associates, Inc.. Edwell, Inc. served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. (Rozier, Carey)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jcharl, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Edwell, Inc. by Plaintiff M Welles and Associates, Inc.. (Rozier, Carey)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rozier, Carey)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, And False Designation Of Origin against Edwell, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8223314)Attorney Carey Matthew Rozier added to party M Welles and Associates, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by M Welles and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Registration of the Trademark, EDWEL, #2 Exhibit B: Webpage: https://www.edwell.org/, #3 Exhibit C: Webpage: https://www.edwell.org/mission, #4 Exhibit D: Webpage: https://www.edwell.org/partners, #5 Exhibit E: Letter Dated October 11, 2021, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Notice to USPTO)(Rozier, Carey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M Welles and Associates, Inc. v. Edwell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Welles and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Carey Matthew Rozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?