Motion Pro, Inc. v. Vevor, Inc.
Plaintiff: Motion Pro, Inc.
Defendant: Vevor, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03380
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Vevor, Inc. by Plaintiff Motion Pro, Inc.. (Pasquinelli, Kevin)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Motion Pro, Inc.. Vevor, Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Pasquinelli, Kevin)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/16/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (norlin, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pasquinelli, Kevin)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Vevor, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8229224)Attorney Kevin Martin Pasquinelli added to party Motion Pro, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Motion Pro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Pasquinelli, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motion Pro, Inc. v. Vevor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motion Pro, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Martin Pasquinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vevor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?