Ornelas v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Albert Lee Ornelas
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2021cv03391
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Albert Lee Ornelas All parties consent.. (Abbott, Teresa)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document)(Pedderson, Danielle)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #2 Application To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/20/2021. (athom, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 2/15/2022. Text Only Entry (athom, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Alan Agee. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Teresa H. Abbott on behalf of ALBERT LEE ORNELASAttorney Teresa H. Abbott added to party ALBERT LEE ORNELAS(pty:pla) (Abbott, Teresa)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff ALBERT LEE ORNELAS. (Agee, Alan)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR REVIEW against Kilolo Kijakazi Attorney Alan M. Agee added to party ALBERT LEE ORNELAS(pty:pla), filed by ALBERT LEE ORNELAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Agee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ornelas v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lee Ornelas
Represented By: Teresa H. Abbott
Represented By: Alan M. Agee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?