Havel v. Peak 10 Publishing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tomas Havel
Defendant: Peak 10 Publishing LLC and Survival Frog, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03395
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tomas Havel. Survival Frog, LLC served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
January 27, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tomas Havel. Peak 10 Publishing LLC served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTINGSCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/20/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/3/2022. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/10/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-2] is February 24, 2022. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/20/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/20/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/3/2022. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/10/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (alave, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (norlin, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement - Injunctive Relief Demanded against Peak 10 Publishing LLC, Survival Frog, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8231941)Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Tomas Havel(pty:pla), filed by Tomas Havel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright)(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havel v. Peak 10 Publishing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Havel
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak 10 Publishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survival Frog, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?