Gleeton v. Bash et al
Plaintiff: Orreal Gleeton
Defendant: Arthur Bash, Arthur(I) Bash, Chrestenson, Chrestenson (I), John Nitsch, John (I) Nitsch, Arthur (I) Bash and (I) Chrestenson
Case Number: 1:2021cv03435
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's #8 Motion for Time Extension is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff shall comply with the #7 Order To File Amended Prisoner Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Minute Order. This action may be dismissed without further notice if he fails to do so. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 02/08/2022.(sdunb, )
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Prisoner Complaint by Plaintiff Orreal Gleeton. (sdunb, )
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain and use the current court-approved Prisoner Complaint form (with the assistance of his case manager or the facility's legal assistant), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff must complete all sections of the form. The Amended Prisoner Complaint must be double-spaced and it shall not exceed 30 pages in length. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, this action may be dismissed in whole or in part without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 01/13/2022. (sdunb, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Orreal Gleeton in the amount of $ 80.67; Receipt Number COX101678. (sdunb, )
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the #2 Prisoner Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied without prejudice as premature because this action is under initial review. Plaintiff may renew his request if this case is later drawn under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c). By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/23/2021. [Copy of Order Emailed] (sdunb, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER'S Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Orreal Gleeton. (norlin, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Orreal Gleeton. (norlin, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Arthur Bash, Arthur(I) Bash, Chrestenson, Chrestenson (I), John Nitsch, John (I) Nitsch, filed by Orreal Gleeton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(norlin, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gleeton v. Bash et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orreal Gleeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur(I) Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrestenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrestenson (I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Nitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur (I) Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Chrestenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?