Johnson v. Denver Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: Myron A. Johnson, Jr.
Defendant: Denver Sheriff Department, Denver Health and Francis
Case Number: 1:2021cv03449
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. In response to the Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. #3 ) entered on December 27, 2021, Plaintiff has submitted on the wrong form a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. #4 ). Plaintiff will be given one more opportunity to cure the deficiencies. In order to cure the deficiencies Plaintiff must file on the proper form a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 along with a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement and a signed authorization to calculate and disburse filing fee payments. Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 2, 2022, to cure the deficiencies. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/2/2022. (trvo, ) (mailed as ordered)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Plaintiff Myron A. Johnson, Jr. (trvo, )
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain the court-approved Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 form (with the assistance of his case manager or the facility's legal assistant), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/27/2021. (sdunb, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Denver Health, Denver Sheriff Department, Francis, filed by Myron A. Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Denver Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron A. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?