Wright v. Respondent Representative
Plaintiff: Charles A Wright
Defendant: Respondent Representative
Case Number: 1:2021cv03476
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915., 2 Case Assigned to Judge, #1 Complaint Addressed to Charles A Wright. (athom, ) Modified on 1/28/2022 to correct filing date (athom, ).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 01/19/2022. The clerk of the court is directed to change Plaintiff's address to the Thornton, Colorado address he provided in the Prisoner Complaint (see ECF No. #1 at 2) in the court's docketing records and mail to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this Minute Order, a copy of the Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies(ECF No. #4 ). Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this minute order to cure the designated deficiencies in this action. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. (athom, ) (all mailed as ordered)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, Addressed to Charles A. Wright. (jsalz, )
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. The Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff two copies of the current Court-approved Prisoner Complaint form and Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 form, along with one copy of the applicable instructions. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/29/2021. (athom, ) (forms and instructions mailed as ordered)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Charles A Wright. (jcharl, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Respondent Representative, filed by Charles A Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(jcharl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Respondent Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Respondent Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?