Pagenkopf v. Jefferson County Sherriff Department
Plaintiff: Lawrence Pagenkopf and Lawrence Allen Pagenkopf
Defendant: Jefferson County Sherriff Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv03494
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #5 Order on 02/10/2022. (sdunb, )
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to prosecute and cure the deficiencies as directed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/10/2022. (sdunb, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain and utilize the current court-approved form Complaint, along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either pay the $402.00 filing fee or shall obtain and utilize the current court-approved Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 01/06/2022. (sdunb, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Sherriff Department, filed by Lawrence Pagenkopf.(sdunb, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Sherriff Department, filed by Lawrence Pagenkopf. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jcharl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagenkopf v. Jefferson County Sherriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Pagenkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Allen Pagenkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Sherriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?