Claridge Associates, LLC et al v. Schepis et al
Plaintiff: Lillian Schneider, Jamiscott, LLC, Claridge Associates, LLC and Leslie Schneider
Defendant: Frank Canelas, Northeast Capital Management, LLC, Ruth Canelas and Anthony Schepis
Interested Party: Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine PC
Case Number: 1:2021mc00089
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7 May 2021. The stipulated motion to Continue Hearing and Hold Briefing in Abeyance #11 is granted as follows. The oral argument set for May 12, 2021 is vacated, to be reset at a later date if necessary. Briefing on the motion to compel (ECF #1 ) shall be held in abeyance until the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware has ruled on the settlement agreement between the parties in the Underlying Litigation. If that court does not approve the settlement agreement, Plaintiffs' reply to the motion to compel shall be due on or before seven days after the denial. While the parties may (and should) alert the Court sooner if a decision is reached, the parties are directed to file a status report on or before June 7, 2021 regarding the status of the settlement agreement. The Court will set a deadline for the filing of dismissal papers in this action at a later date. (cmadr, )
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Hearing and Hold Briefing in Abeyance by Plaintiffs Claridge Associates, LLC, Jamiscott, LLC, Leslie Schneider, Lillian Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Henry, Lance)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #8 Order,,, by Plaintiffs Claridge Associates, LLC, Jamiscott, LLC, Leslie Schneider, Lillian Schneider. (Henry, Lance)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Interested Party Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Hearing, Gregory)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 April 2021. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the oral argument set for May 11, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for May 12, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Counsel for the parties shall appear for oral argument and may appear in person or by video. Anyone appearing by video shall do so by following the instructions attached to this Minute Order as an exhibit. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Minute Order on all parties that have not appeared as of the time this Minute Order is issued. Plaintiffs shall file a certificate of service showing they have done so on or before April 28, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Video Conference Instructions) (cmadr, )
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER Setting Motion Hearing for 5/11/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jgonz, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Aaron Tuchmann on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Paul Aaron Tuchmann added to party Claridge Associates, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Aaron Tuchmann added to party Jamiscott, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Aaron Tuchmann added to party Leslie Schneider(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Aaron Tuchmann added to party Lillian Schneider(pty:pla) (Tuchmann, Paul)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Matthew Doroghazi on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney John Matthew Doroghazi added to party Claridge Associates, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Matthew Doroghazi added to party Jamiscott, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Matthew Doroghazi added to party Leslie Schneider(pty:pla), Attorney John Matthew Doroghazi added to party Lillian Schneider(pty:pla) (Doroghazi, John)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Steve Hearing, II on behalf of Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine PCAttorney Gregory Steve Hearing, II added to party Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine PC(pty:ip) (Hearing, Gregory)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John M. Palmeri on behalf of Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine PCAttorney John M. Palmeri added to party Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine PC(pty:ip) (Palmeri, John)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena by Plaintiffs Claridge Associates, LLC, Jamiscott, LLC, Leslie Schneider, Lillian Schneider (Filing fee: $49, Receipt number COX098624). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claridge Associates, LLC et al v. Schepis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Canelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Canelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Schepis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Schneider
Represented By: Lance Henry
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: Paul Aaron Tuchmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamiscott, LLC
Represented By: Lance Henry
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: Paul Aaron Tuchmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claridge Associates, LLC
Represented By: Lance Henry
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: Paul Aaron Tuchmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Schneider
Represented By: Lance Henry
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: Paul Aaron Tuchmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine PC
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Gregory Steve Hearing, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?