CLVM LLC et al v. Van Handel
Plaintiff: CLVM LLC doing business as Valimenta Labs and Emek Blair
Defendant: Eric Van Handel
Case Number: 1:2022cv00141
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
2 Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Eric Van Handel. (Dallner, James)
March 14, 2022 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Emek Blair, CLVM LLC. (Baskerville, Henry)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 March 2022. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference set for March 21, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. is rescheduled for 10:30 a.m. (TIME CHANGE ONLY) in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. All other aspects of this Court's March 3, 2022 minute order remain in effect. (cmadr, )
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER discharging #14 Order to Show Cause. Having reviewed and considered #15 Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause, the Court finds that diversity of citizenship has been sufficiently established at this stage and therefore DISCHARGES its #14 Order to Show Cause. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/3/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
March 2, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Emek Blair, CLVM LLC. (Baskerville, Henry)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 16 February 2022. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Reset Scheduling Conference #17 is granted. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the pending motion to dismiss on or before March 2, 2022. Additionally, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for February 24, 2022 is vacated and rescheduled for March 21, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
February 15, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss and to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by CLVM LLC, Emek Blair. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/15/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
February 15, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss and to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Emek Blair, CLVM LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Baskerville, Henry)
February 15, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Eric Van Handel All parties do not consent.. (Dallner, James)
February 15, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 by Defendant Eric Van Handel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Dallner, #2 Exhibit Assessor Record, #3 Exhibit Voter Reg, #4 Exhibit Operating Agt, #5 Exhibit Def Brief in Opp, #6 Exhibit Order, #7 Exhibit Order Denying PI, #8 Exhibit Docket, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Van Handel)(Dallner, James)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Show Cause. On or before February 15, 2022, Defendant shall show cause, in writing, as to why this case should not be remanded, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction, by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/1/2022. (angar, )
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles J. Hegarty, II on behalf of Eric Van HandelAttorney Charles J. Hegarty, II added to party Eric Van Handel(pty:dft) (Hegarty, Charles)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eric Van Handel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 1/27/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Eric Van Handel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James E. Dallner, #2 Exhibit State Ct Complaint, #3 Exhibit Answer & Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit Order on Motion to Amend, #5 Exhibit Blair Letter, #6 Exhibit Van Handel Response to Pltfs Demand)(Dallner, James)
January 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Tillotson Hartsel on behalf of Emek Blair, CLVM LLCAttorney Elizabeth Tillotson Hartsel added to party Emek Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Tillotson Hartsel added to party CLVM LLC(pty:pla) (Hartsel, Elizabeth)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Henry Marwood Baskerville, IV on behalf of Emek Blair, CLVM LLCAttorney Henry Marwood Baskerville, IV added to party Emek Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Henry Marwood Baskerville, IV added to party CLVM LLC(pty:pla) (Baskerville, Henry)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 January 2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2022 11:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 1/19/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, District Court Civil Cover Sheet, District Court Civil Summons - Eric Van Handel, Notice Judicial Civil Case Management, Complaint - Exhibit C, Complaint - Exhibit A, Complaint - Exhibit B upon Eric Van Handel on 12/23/2021 (norlin, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Eric Van Handel, filed by CLVM LLC, Emek Blair.(norlin, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eric Van Handel from Larimer County District Court - State of Colorado, Case Number 2021cv30921. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8274224), filed by Eric Van Handel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint - State Court, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit Barker Note, #4 Exhibit Settlement Agt, #5 Exhibit Affidavit - Van Handel - State Court, #6 Exhibit Summons - Van Handel - State Court, #7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet - State Court, #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - State Court, #9 Exhibit Notice of Judicial Civil Case Management - State Court, #10 Exhibit Current State Court Docket Sheet, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Fed)(Dallner, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLVM LLC et al v. Van Handel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLVM LLC doing business as Valimenta Labs
Represented By: Elizabeth Tillotson Hartsel
Represented By: Henry Marwood Baskerville, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emek Blair
Represented By: Elizabeth Tillotson Hartsel
Represented By: Henry Marwood Baskerville, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Van Handel
Represented By: James E. Dallner
Represented By: Charles J. Hegarty, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?