Grimes v. Tom's Towing et al
Plaintiff: Jerome L. Grimes
Defendant: Tom's Towing, LLC and Terry Steer
Case Number: 1:2022cv00203
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice for the reasons discussed above, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/4/2022.(angar, )
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Jerome L. Grimes. (trvo, )
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Terry Steer, Tom's Towing, LLC, filed by Jerome L. Grimes.(trvo, )
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/25/2022. (angar, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terry Steer, Tom's Towing, filed by Jerome L. Grimes.(norlin, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Tom's Towing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome L. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom's Towing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?