Saxena v. City of Denver, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Grant Mitchell Saxena
Defendant: City of Denver, Colorado, Jordan Gabriel and Mark Allen
Case Number: 1:2022cv00277
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Filing 8 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #7 Order of Dismissal on 03/23/2022. (athom, )
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with a Court order and failure to pay the required filing fee. IFP on appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 03/23/2022. (athom, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 03/01/2022. Plaintiff will be granted an extension of time-until March 14, 2022-to pay the filing fee in full. Plaintiff is again reminded that, if he fails to pay the full amount of $402.00 within the time allowed, the complaint and this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (athom, )
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER Notice of Fee Waiver by Plaintiff Grant Mitchell Saxena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grant Saxena - SSI)(Saxena, Grant)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED. If Plaintiff fails to pay the full amount of $402.00 within the time allowed, the complaint and the action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/02/2022.(athom, )
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Plaintiff Grant Mitchell Saxena. (jtorr, )
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Allen, City of Denver, Colorado, Jordan Gabriel, filed by Grant Mitchell Saxena. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saxena v. City of Denver, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Mitchell Saxena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denver, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?