Linton v. Embry
Plaintiff: Fredrica Renee Linton
Defendant: Barbara E. Embry
Case Number: 1:2022cv00680
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) filed by Plaintiff Fredrica Renee Linton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Wells Fargo RCA Checking, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Wells Fargo RCA Savings)(O'Neill, Timothy)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER In light of #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) (the "Motion"), the Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2022 09:15 AM, and associated deadlines, are VACATED to be reset, if necessary, after a ruling on the Motion. If the Court determines that it has subject matter jurisdiction, the parties shall jointly call chambers at 303.335.2365 within 7 days after a ruling on the Motion to set this matter for a scheduling conference. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/11/2022. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) filed by Barbara E. Embry. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/11/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) by Defendant Barbara E. Embry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Eirich, Jeanette)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fredrica Renee Linton. Barbara E. Embry served on 3/19/2022, answer due 4/9/2022. (O'Neill, Timothy)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 21 March 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/26/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2022 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge vARHOLAK is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/18/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment and Jury Demand against Barbara E Embry (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8370094)Attorney Timothy G. O'Neill added to party Fredrica Renee Linton(pty:pla), filed by Fredrica Renee Linton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Wells Fargo RCA-Checking, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Wells Fargo RCA-Savings, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Colorado Petition, #5 Summons Summons - Barbara E Embry)(O'Neill, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linton v. Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrica Renee Linton
Represented By: Timothy G. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara E. Embry
Represented By: Jeanette Suzanne Eirich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?