CIS Insurance Services, LLC v. MGA Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: CIS Insurance Services, LLC
Defendant: MGA Systems, Inc. and NetRate Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01219
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MGA Systems, Inc..(Doherty, Peter)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter H. Doherty on behalf of MGA Systems, Inc.Attorney Peter H. Doherty added to party MGA Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Doherty, Peter)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9-6-2022 at 11:00 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, 7 days before the Telephonic Scheduling Conference (on or before 8-30-2022). The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#3-1] is due 8-30-2022. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6-16-2022. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CIS Insurance Services, LLC. MGA Systems, Inc. served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Anderson, Derek)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Anderson, Derek)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against MGA Systems, Inc. f/k/a NetRate Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8462315)Attorney Derek C. Anderson added to party CIS Insurance Services, LLC(pty:pla), filed by CIS Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Defendant)(Anderson, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIS Insurance Services, LLC v. MGA Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGA Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Peter H. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetRate Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Peter H. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIS Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Derek C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?