Saee v. Enservco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ali Saee
Defendant: Enservco Corporation, Richard A. Murphy and Marjorie A. Hargrave
Case Number: 1:2022cv01267
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/23/2022. Text Only Entry (dddlc4)
June 23, 2022 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01267-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Enservco Corporation, Marjorie A. Hargrave, Richard A. Murphy All parties do not consent.. (Farooqui, Megan)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court regarding #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint, which the Court construes as a motion to alter a number of case deadlines. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART. The deadline to file the form indicating consent/nonconsent to magistrate judge jurisdiction remains 7/14/2022. The Proposed scheduling order deadline is VACATED. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2022 is CONVERTED to a Status Conference set for 7/28/2022 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is STAYED pending further discussion between the parties and the Court at the 7/28/22 Status Conference. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/23/2022. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Megan M. Farooqui on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Megan M. Farooqui added to party Enservco Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Megan M. Farooqui added to party Marjorie A. Hargrave(pty:dft), Attorney Megan M. Farooqui added to party Richard A. Murphy(pty:dft) (Farooqui, Megan)
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Marjorie A. Hargrave, Richard A. Murphy, Enservco Corporation. All Defendants. (MacPhail, Michael)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael R. MacPhail on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael R. MacPhail added to party Enservco Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R. MacPhail added to party Marjorie A. Hargrave(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R. MacPhail added to party Richard A. Murphy(pty:dft) (MacPhail, Michael)
June 8, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ali Saee. Marjorie A. Hargrave waiver sent on 5/23/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 8, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ali Saee. Richard A. Murphy waiver sent on 5/23/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 8, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ali Saee. Enservco Corporation waiver sent on 5/23/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 24 May 2022. Consent Form due by 7/14/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/21/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2022 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
May 24, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/24/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01267-STV. (trvo, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Ali SaeeAttorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II added to party Ali Saee(pty:pla) (Hood, Joseph)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Enservco Corporation, Marjorie A. Hargrave, Richard A. Murphy (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8468698)Attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman added to party Ali Saee(pty:pla), filed by Ali Saee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saee v. Enservco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Saee
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enservco Corporation
Represented By: Megan M. Farooqui
Represented By: Michael R. MacPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Murphy
Represented By: Megan M. Farooqui
Represented By: Michael R. MacPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie A. Hargrave
Represented By: Megan M. Farooqui
Represented By: Michael R. MacPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?