Juul Labs Inc. v. Get Your Wax On LLC
Defendant: JUUL LABS INC. and Get Your Wax On LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01268
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal #11 filed in this case on 6/10/2022. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on #11 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal. All deadlines and conferences in this case are VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/10/22. Text Only Entry (stvlc3, Andrew)
June 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Juul Labs Inc. (Brenner, Scott)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 23 May 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/20/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2022 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2021 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/ 23/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/23/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sapod, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (sapod, )
May 20, 2022 Filing 10 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (sapod, )
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE Report on Filing of Action re: Trademark by Defendant JUUL LABS INC. (Brenner, Scott)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Get Your Wax On LLC by Defendant JUUL LABS INC.. (Brenner, Scott)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Brenner, Scott)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JUUL LABS INC. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8469102)Attorney Scott E. Brenner added to party JUUL LABS INC.(pty:dft), filed by JUUL LABS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brenner, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs Inc. v. Get Your Wax On LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS INC.
Represented By: Scott E. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get Your Wax On LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?