Saiz v. HCA-Healthone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tania Saiz
Defendant: HCA-Healthone, LLC doing business as Sky Ridge Medical Center and Richard Scott Talbot
Case Number: 1:2022cv01734
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT /Return of Service of Notice of Commencement of Action upon Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield an Anthem Company by Plaintiff Tania Saiz. (Astuno, John)
September 1, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Commencement of Action by Plaintiff Tania Saiz (Astuno, John)
August 18, 2022 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Clark, Stephanie)
August 18, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HCA-Healthone, LLC.(Clark, Stephanie)
August 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephanie Lynn Clark on behalf of HCA-Healthone, LLCAttorney Stephanie Lynn Clark added to party HCA-Healthone, LLC(pty:dft) (Clark, Stephanie)
August 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacqueline B. Sharuzi-Brown on behalf of HCA-Healthone, LLCAttorney Jacqueline B. Sharuzi-Brown added to party HCA-Healthone, LLC(pty:dft) (Sharuzi-Brown, Jacqueline)
August 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Casey Cole Kannenberg on behalf of HCA-Healthone, LLCAttorney Casey Cole Kannenberg added to party HCA-Healthone, LLC(pty:dft) (Kannenberg, Casey)
August 16, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Review as to Defendant Richard Scott Talbot, D.O. by Plaintiff Tania Saiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Review HCA-Healthone dba Sky Ridge Medical Center)(Astuno, John)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a completed Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #6 ) shall be filed no later than seven calendar days before the conference.At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/12/2022. Text Only Entry (amont, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 12 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #11 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Stephen Jerome Hensen. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature followed by a complete signature block to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
August 10, 2022 Filing 11 Defendant Richard Talbot ANSWER to #1 Complaint Attorney Stephen Jerome Hensen added to party Richard Scott Talbot(pty:dft) by Richard Scott Talbot.(Hensen, Stephen)
August 9, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tania Saiz. Richard Scott Talbot served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (Astuno, John)
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tania Saiz. HCA-Healthone, LLC served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (Astuno, John)
July 18, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to HCA-HEALTHONE DBA SKY RIDGE MEDICAL CENTER AND RICHARD SCOTT TALBOT, D.O. by Plaintiff Tania Saiz. (Attachments: #1 Request)(Astuno, John)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
July 14, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/14/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01734-SKC. (trvo, )
July 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Wallace Ford on behalf of Tania Saiz (Ford, Christopher)
July 13, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (norlin, )
July 13, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8550250)Attorney John J. Astuno, Jr added to party Tania Saiz(pty:pla), filed by Tania Saiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Astuno, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saiz v. HCA-Healthone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tania Saiz
Represented By: Christopher Wallace Ford
Represented By: John J. Astuno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA-Healthone, LLC doing business as Sky Ridge Medical Center
Represented By: Casey Cole Kannenberg
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Sharuzi-Brown
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Scott Talbot
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?