Crawford v. Tristar Risk Management
Plaintiff: Travis Crawford
Defendant: Tristar Risk Management
Case Number: 1:2022cv02248
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 t - Diversity: Torts
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 18 October 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/14/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2022 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/18/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/17/2022, re: #17 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Tristar Risk Management. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause, Docket No. 14, is hereby DISCHARGED. (sphil, )
October 17, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 by Defendant Tristar Risk Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hearing, Gregory)
October 17, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 by Plaintiff Travis Crawford. (Taussig, John)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the court sua sponte. In light of the #14 Order to Show Cause, the Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2022 09:45 AM and the Proposed Scheduling Order deadlines are VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/11/2022. Text Only Entry (stvlc3, Andrew)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/5/2022. ORDERED that, on or before October 17, 2022, defendant shall show cause why this case should not be remanded to state court due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
October 5, 2022 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-02248-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 4, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Tristar Risk Management All parties do not consent.. (Hearing, Gregory)
September 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John G. Taussig, III on behalf of Travis CrawfordAttorney John G. Taussig, III added to party Travis Crawford(pty:pla) (Taussig, John)
September 14, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Tristar Risk Management.(Hearing, Gregory)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2 September 2022. Consent Form due by 10/4/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/11/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2022 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-022048-STV. (athom, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Tristar Risk Management, filed by Travis Crawford.(tgall, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Abigail Hope Perkins on behalf of Tristar Risk ManagementAttorney Abigail Hope Perkins added to party Tristar Risk Management(pty:dft) (Perkins, Abigail)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tristar Risk Management from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2022CV30511. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8635711), filed by Tristar Risk Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - CO SOS, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Coversheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hearing, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Tristar Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Crawford
Represented By: John G. Taussig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Risk Management
Represented By: Abigail Hope Perkins
Represented By: Gregory Steve Hearing, II
Represented By: Abigail H Kregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?