Rohloff v. Baer
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Rohloff
Defendant: Robert M. Baer
Case Number: 1:2022cv02572
Filed: October 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Robert M. Baer.(Gelman, David)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint is extended to 11/21/2022. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/31/2022. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Robert M. Baer. (Gelman, David)
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey J. Rohloff. Robert M. Baer served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Brake, Andrew)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5 October 2022. Consent Form due by 12/20/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/28/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
October 3, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
October 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Robert M. Baer (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8688988)Attorney Andrew T. Brake added to party Jeffrey J Rohloff(pty:pla), filed by Jeffrey J Rohloff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Review)(Brake, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohloff v. Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Rohloff
Represented By: Andrew T. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Baer
Represented By: David Ben Gelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?