Godinez et al v. Puebla et al
Plaintiff: Christian Godinez and Abigail Godinez
Defendant: Jesus Puebla, Jose Mauricio Coreas d/b/a Caminantes Trucking, Carlos Coreas, Lucky 22, Inc. and Jose Mauricio Coreas doing business as Caminantes Trucking
Case Number: 1:2022cv02606
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Susan Prose
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #63 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Alan Watts and signed by attorney Rufino Jerome Aquino. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE - future documents must be filed using the CM/ECF login of the attorney(s) whose signature is on the pleading and in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 8/25/2023, GRANTING #60 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Carlos Coreas and Lucky 22, Inc. have up to and including 8/28/2023 to respond to Plaintiffs' discovery requests. The deadline to amend pleadings and join parties is now 9/4/2023. Text Only Entry (splc3)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of R. Jerome Aquino by Michael Alan Watts on behalf of Carlos Coreas, Lucky 22, Inc. (Watts, Michael)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE to #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responses to Written Discovery Requests filed by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Emails between counsel)(Lawson, Grant) Modified on 8/24/2023 to correct text (trvo, ).
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM regarding #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responses to Written Discovery Requests filed by Lucky 22, Inc., Carlos Coreas. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan B. Prose. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/22/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Responses to Written Discovery Requests by Defendants Carlos Coreas, Lucky 22, Inc.. (Watts, Michael) Modified on 8/22/2023 to correct text (trvo, ).
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents-Wells Fargo [Jose Coreas] upon Sarai Martin-CT Corporation-Agent for Service on 08/10/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Lawson, Grant)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents-Citibank [Jose Coreas] upon Sarai Martin-CT Corporation-Agent for Service on 08/10/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Lawson, Grant)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents-Chase Bank [Jose Coreas] upon Sarai Martin-CT Corporation-Agent for Service on 08/10/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Lawson, Grant)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents-Bank of America [Coreas Trucking] upon Sarai Martin-CT Corporation-Agent for Service on 08/10/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Lawson, Grant)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents-Bank of America [Jose Coreas] upon Sarai Martin-CT Corporation-Agent for Service on 08/10/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Lawson, Grant)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan B. Prose: Status Conference held on 8/2/2023. The Motion to Vacate Deadline for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings, ECF No. #52 , is GRANTED. The deadline for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings is extended to August 28, 2023. A telephonic Status Conference is set for September 18, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties may attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. FTR: C205. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM regarding #52 MOTION to Vacate Deadline for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings filed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan B. Prose. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 07/28/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Vacate Deadline for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Lawson, Grant)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Non-Party - Wells Fargo by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Produce Documents-Wells Fargo)(Lawson, Grant)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Non-Party - Citibank by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Produce Documents-Citibank)(Lawson, Grant)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Non-Party - Chase Bank by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Produce Documents-Chase Bank)(Lawson, Grant)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Non-Party - Bank of America [Coreas Trucking] by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Produce Documents-Bank of America [Coreas Trucking])(Lawson, Grant)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Produce Documents on Non-Party - Bank of America by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Produce Documents-Bank of America)(Lawson, Grant)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 7/19/2023. Status Conference set telephonically for 8/2/2023, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties may attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. Text Only Entry (splc3)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER. The Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #44 ] is DENIED without prejudice. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/28/2023.(trvo, )
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Jose Mauricio Coreas SAFER 7-24-22, #2 Exhibit 2-Jose Mauricio Coreas Safety Measurement System Overview 3-7-23, #3 Exhibit 3-Cancellation of Coverage, #4 Exhibit 4-No Coverage for 6-13-22 Crash)(Lawson, Grant)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to ECF No. 37, the Status Conference set for June 21, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Neureiter is VACATED. Counsel shall jointly contact Magistrate Judge Prose's Chambers to reset the Status Conference. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on June 20, 2023. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin C. Mankin on behalf of Jesus PueblaAttorney Justin C. Mankin added to party Jesus Puebla(pty:dft) (Mankin, Justin)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 06/15/2023. The motion to compel, ECF No. #39 , does not certify that Plaintiffs conferred with Defendants before filing the motion, as Plaintiffs were required to do. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1. In addition, although the motion seeks discovery, Plaintiffs did not comply with the discovery dispute procedures of Judge Wang and Magistrate Judge Prose. See Judge Wang's Standing Order Regarding Discovery Dispute Procedures, Part A.1; Magistrate Judge Prose's Practice Standards for Civil Cases, Part IV. Accordingly, the motion, ECF No. #39 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Plaintiffs to confer with Defendants and after that, if necessary, contact MJ Prose's chambers to arrange for a discovery dispute hearing. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding #39 MOTION to Compel Progressive Insurance to Respond to Subpoena to Produce Documents Served filed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/13/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Compel Progressive Insurance to Respond to Subpoena to Produce Documents Served by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Service on Progressive 3-30-23, #2 Exhibit 2-Service on Progressive 4-21-23, #3 Exhibit 3-Subpoena Packet 3-22-23, #4 Exhibit 4-Subpoena Packet 4-19-23, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion to Compel Progressive Insurance to Respond to Subpoena to Produce Documents)(Lawson, Grant)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Defendant Jesus Puebla's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, and Jury Demand Attorney Grant T. Spillers added to party Jesus Puebla(pty:dft), ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Attorney Grant T. Spillers added to party Jesus Puebla(pty:dft) by Jesus Puebla.(Spillers, Grant)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose upon her appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Prose at the end of the civil action number (such as 22-cv-02606-NYW-SP). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Prose in Courtroom C-205. Her chambers are located in Room C-254 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. Her telephone number is 303-335-2722. (Text only entry) (csarr, )
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. (Lawson, Grant)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. Jesus Puebla served on 3/20/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (Lawson, Grant)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Defendant Carlos Coreas' ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Carlos Coreas.(Watts, Michael)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, )
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jesus Puebla via James Colgan by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Lawson, Grant)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jesus Puebla by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Lawson, Grant)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 3/8/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service (Dkt. #26 ) is GRANTED with the modification that in addition to service on Mr. Puebla's defense attorney, James Colgan, that service be sent via registered mail to Mr. Puebla's last known address. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on March 1, 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is SET on Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service (Dkt. #26 ) on March 8, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# to participate. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER (csarr, )
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. Carlos Coreas waiver sent on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Lawson, Grant)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM regarding #26 Motion for Order to Alternative Service filed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/23/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc4, )
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Order to Alternative Service by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - TAR, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Non Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Non Service 2, #5 Exhibit 5 - Body Camera Photo, #6 Exhibit 6 - Puebla Mugshot, #7 Exhibit 7 - Process Server Email, #8 Exhibit 8 - Entry of Appearance, #9 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Chenchar, Joseph)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on February 15, 2023. (rvill, )
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/16/2023. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 6/21/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# to participate. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez All parties do not consent.. (Lawson, Grant)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #21 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Joseph P. Chenchar. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Paul Chenchar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Joseph Paul Chenchar added to party Abigail Godinez(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Paul Chenchar added to party Christian Godinez(pty:pla) (Chenchar, Joseph)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Lawson, Grant)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #18 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information filed by attorney Michael Watts. Counsel has properly informed the court and all case participants of a change in contact information. With the exception of secondary email addresses, however, all changes in contact information must be effectuated through each counsel's NextGen Pacer account. The Court can no longer change contact information locally. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage My Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Michael Alan Watts (Watts, Michael)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendant Lucky 22, Inc.'s ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand Attorney Michael Alan Watts added to party Lucky 22, Inc.(pty:dft) by Lucky 22, Inc..(Watts, Michael)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 November 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/8/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/23/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc4,).
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiffs' #13 Response to Order to Show Cause and Plaintiffs' #11 Amended Complaint, the Court is satisfied that complete diversity exists among the named parties and that subject-matter jurisdiction exists in this case. Therefore, the #9 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/23/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc4,)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #9 by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lawson, Grant)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #11 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline - First Amended Complaint)(Lawson, Grant)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carlos Coreas, Jose Mauricio Coreas, Lucky 22, Inc., Jesus Puebla, filed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez.(Lawson, Grant)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. Lucky 22, Inc. served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service by Grant H. Lawson, #2 Exhibit CO Sec of State listing, #3 Exhibit FMCSA Report, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Non Service, #5 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Lawson, Grant)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing and on or before November 18, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/09/2022. (sdunb, ) Modified on 11/25/2022 to discharge pursuant to 14 Order (trvo, ).
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jose Mauricio Coreas. By Clerk. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jose Mauricio Coreas d/b/a Caminantes Trucking by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FMCSA Details, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Grant H. Lawson, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Entering Default)(Lawson, Grant)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. Jose Mauricio Coreas served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022. (Lawson, Grant)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, )
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jose M. Coreas, Lucky 22, Inc, Jesus Puebla, Carlos R. Coreas by Plaintiffs Abigail Godinez, Christian Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jose M. Coreas, #2 Summons Lucky 22, Inc., #3 Summons Jose Puebla, #4 Summons Carlos R. Coreas)(Lawson, Grant)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The Summons submitted are incomplete and not issued. Please file completed Summons with full caption for issuance using the event Summons Request. (tgall, )
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Carlos Coreas, Jose Mauricio Coreas, Lucky 22, Inc., Jesus Puebla (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8696815)Attorney Grant Harvey Lawson added to party Abigail Godinez(pty:pla), Attorney Grant Harvey Lawson added to party Christian Godinez(pty:pla), filed by Christian Godinez, Abigail Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Carlos Coreas, #3 Summons Jesus Puebla, #4 Summons Jose Coreas, #5 Summons Lucky 22, Inc.)(Lawson, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godinez et al v. Puebla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Godinez
Represented By: Grant Harvey Lawson
Represented By: Joseph Paul Chenchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Godinez
Represented By: Grant Harvey Lawson
Represented By: Joseph Paul Chenchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Puebla
Represented By: Grant T. Spillers
Represented By: Justin C. Mankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Mauricio Coreas d/b/a Caminantes Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Coreas
Represented By: Michael Alan Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky 22, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Alan Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Mauricio Coreas doing business as Caminantes Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?