USA v. Liberty Global Inc.
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Liberty Global Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02622
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
2 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File re #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines. The deadline for parties to hold a Rule 26(f) conference is 1/23/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/6/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2023 11:30 AM, or other date as the Magistrate Judge deems appropriate, in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/16/2022. Text Only Entry(rbjlc5, )
November 15, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion to Extend Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hoenig, Isaac)
November 15, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Liberty Global Inc. waiver sent on 10/21/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. (Hoenig, Isaac)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. After conferral pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3.2(d), and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 40.1(d)(4)(B) and the approval of the Chief Judge, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated 1:22-cv-02622-RBJ-STV. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/26/2022. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) Modified on 10/26/2022 to add text (athom, ).
October 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Isaac M. Hoenig on behalf of USA (Hoenig, Isaac)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11 October 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/7/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2022 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/7/2022. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
October 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Ramirez, E.)
October 7, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Global Inc., filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2)(Ramirez, E.)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Global Inc. Attorney E. Carmen Ramirez added to party United States(pty:pla), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Summons)(Ramirez, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Liberty Global Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: E. Carmen Ramirez
Represented By: Isaac M. Hoenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Global Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?