Bailey v. American Land & Leisure, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valerie Bailey
Defendant: American Land & Leisure, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03067
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/24/2023. (athom, )
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/24/23. (lgale, )
January 24, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/24/2023. Discovery due by 9/1/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2023. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
January 24, 2023 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant American Land & Leisure, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Olson, Elizabeth)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a)and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a SchedulingOrder that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders asappropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, furtherthat the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of JudgeBlackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred,subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referredas defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. Onthe recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the partiesby motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, asettlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/18/2023. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
January 18, 2023 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-03067-REB. (Text Only Entry). (alave, )
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/18/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge underD.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) re: #15 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Valerie Bailey (alave, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Valerie Bailey All parties do not consent.. (Alleman, Jason)
January 17, 2023 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Valerie Bailey. (Alleman, Jason)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/11/2023. (alave, )
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Olson, Elizabeth)
December 5, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by American Land & Leisure, Inc..(Olson, Elizabeth)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Olson, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/01/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/17/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 1/24/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chad Patrick Hemmat on behalf of Valerie BaileyAttorney Chad Patrick Hemmat added to party Valerie Bailey(pty:pla) (Hemmat, Chad)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cameron Oren Hunter on behalf of Valerie BaileyAttorney Cameron Oren Hunter added to party Valerie Bailey(pty:pla) (Hunter, Cameron)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Glenn Alleman on behalf of Valerie BaileyAttorney Jason Glenn Alleman added to party Valerie Bailey(pty:pla) (Alleman, Jason)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against American Land & Leisure, Inc., filed by Valerie Bailey.(norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Land & Leisure, Inc. from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2022CV31939. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8798051), filed by American Land & Leisure, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit C - Summons, #5 Exhibit D - Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit E - Initial Procedural Order, #7 Exhibit F - District Court Docket, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Olson, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. American Land & Leisure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Bailey
Represented By: Jason Glenn Alleman
Represented By: Cameron Oren Hunter
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Land & Leisure, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?