Gyallay-Pap v. Coulson
Plaintiff: Kimnath Gyallay-Pap
Defendant: Vallen Coulson
Case Number: 1:2022cv03068
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2 December 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/1/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-1] is January 25, 2023. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/2/2022. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Vallen Coulson re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kimnath Gyallay-Pap. (Hemmat, Chad)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Vallen Coulson (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8798168)Attorney Chad Patrick Hemmat added to party Kimnath Gyallay-Pap(pty:pla), filed by Kimnath Gyallay-Pap. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hemmat, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gyallay-Pap v. Coulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimnath Gyallay-Pap
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallen Coulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?