Black v. Black
Petitioner: Joanne Black
Respondent: Bernard Black and Bernard S. Black
Case Number: 1:2022cv03098
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Change Venue , #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause Attorney Lisa R. DiPonio added to party Joanne Black(pty:pet) filed by Petitioner Joanne Black. (DiPonio, Lisa)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Respondent's Response #11 to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter's Order to Show Cause #5 is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Reureiter for a report and recommendation on an order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 01/06/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc5, )
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/4/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
January 4, 2023 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-03098-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4 January 2023. On December 2, 2022, this Court ordered Mr. Black to show cause why thiscause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Dkt. #5 ) In his response to the Order to Show Cause, Mr. Black requests that the Order to Show Cause and his response be reviewed by a district judge. (See Dkt. #11 at 2.) Because Mr. Black proceeds pro se and in an abundance of caution, the Court construes this as a non-consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge and directs the Clerk of Court to randomly reassign this matter to a district judge. This Court will therefore withhold ruling on its Order to Show Cause (Dkt. #11) unless directed otherwise by the assigned district judge. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to Response to Order to Show Cause by Respondent Bernard S. Black. (Black, Bernard)
December 20, 2022 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #12 Response filed by pro se e-filer Bernard S. Black. The document was not filed electronically. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.1(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 12 Duplicate copy of #11 Response by Bernard Black, Issue Trust trustee, to Court Order to Show Cause by Respondent Bernard S. Black. (csarr, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Respondent Bernard S. Black, Petitioner Joanne Black. (Black, Bernard)
December 8, 2022 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #7 MOTION to Change Venue , #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause filed by Bernard S. Black. Pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7 December 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion by Bernard Black, appearing pro se as trustee of the Issue Trust, for additional time to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause dated December 2, 2022 and for permission to carry out service by email (Dkt. #8 ) is GRANTED IN PART as follows. Mr. Black shall respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause on or before December 19, 2022. Further, Mr. Black is permitted to file his response with the Court via email to cod_prose_filing@cod.uscourts.gov. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause by Respondent Bernard S. Black. (Black, Bernard)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue by Respondent Bernard S. Black. (Black, Bernard)
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #5 Order to Show Cause, to Lisa DiPonio, Esq., at 7931 S. Broadway, #348 Littleton, CO and Gayle Y.L. Young, at P.O. Box 307 Littleton, CO 80160. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2 December 2022. For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before December 9,2022, Mr. Black shall (1) demonstrate that he is licensed attorney eligible to practice in this Court and represent the Issue Trust; and (2) show cause in writing why this case should not be remanded due to the procedural improprieties of the removal and the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If Mr. Black is a licensed attorney, he should also show cause why he should not be sanctioned or referred for discipline to the appropriate disciplinary authorities for what appears to be a frivolous and baseless attempt at removal for the purpose of interfering with an ongoing state probate proceeding. (cmadr, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Form Mailed via USPS to Pro Se Respondent. (norlin, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. Removal Notice Mailed via USPS to Counsel for Petitioner and Pro Se Respondent (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Denver County Probate Court, Case Number 2012PR1772. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 Receipt Number COX105263), filed by Bernard Black. (Attachments: #1 State Court Motion, #2 State Court Reply with Exhibits, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(norlin, ) Modified on 12/1/2022 to correct filing date (norlin, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joanne Black
Represented By: Lisa R. DiPonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bernard Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bernard S. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?