Abdo v. USA
Plaintiff: Naser Abdo
Defendant: USA
Interested Party: CASE MANAGER/ INMATE COORDINATOR OF: NASER ABDO
Case Number: 1:2022cv03110
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
2 Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexandra J. Berger on behalf of USAAttorney Alexandra J. Berger added to party USA(pty:dft) (Berger, Alexandra)
January 12, 2023 Filing 16 Acknowledgment of Service on behalf of the United States Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado re: #15 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk on 1/12/2023. (sphil, ) Modified on 1/18/2023 to add text. (sphil, ).
January 12, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #6 Amended Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt)(sphil, )
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 January 2023. Status Conference set for 2/21/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Status Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 1/10/23. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/9/2023. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. ORDERED that the "Motion to Extend All Deadlines by 30 Days"(ECF No. 11), filed on January 3, 2023, is DENIED as moot. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-03110-CNS. (sphil, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend All Deadlines by 30 Days by Plaintiff Naser Abdo. (sphil, )
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/3/2023, re: the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. 3) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deficiencies Deadline(ECF No. 8), filed on December 27, 2022, is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs Motion Showing Cause (ECF No. 7), filed on December 27, 2022, is DENIED as non-responsive. ORDERED that the December 5, 2022 Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 4) is DISCHARGED pursuant to Plaintiffs response filed on December 23, 2022 (ECF No. 5). ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send a copy of this order to FLM-LegalSvcs-S@bop.gov. (sphil, )
December 30, 2022 Filing 9 Prisoner Account STATEMENT by Plaintiff Naser Abdo. (sphil, )
December 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Cure Deficiencies by Plaintiff Naser Abdo. (sdunb, )
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION Showing Cause by Plaintiff Naser Abdo. (sdunb, )
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Naser Abdo.(sdunb, )
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 Motion Showing Cause No. 2 re #4 by Plaintiff Naser Abdo. (athom, )
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency and to Show Cause. Ordered that Plaintiff cure the deficiency designated above within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on the Order. Further ordered that Plaintiff show cause, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency or show cause as directed, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/5/2022. (agarc, )
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Naser Abdo. (tgall, )
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Naser Abdo.(tgall, ) Modified corrected docket text 12/1/2022 (tgall, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdo v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naser Abdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Alexandra J. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CASE MANAGER/ INMATE COORDINATOR OF: NASER ABDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?