The Estate of Amy Lynn Cross et al v. Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bauder and Lisa McMullen
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC, Turn Key Health Clinicians, PLLC, Turn Key Health Clinics Colorado, LLC, Turn Key Health Medical Colorado, PLLC, Erica Alcaraz, Beatriz Ortiz, Kristin Miller, Teresa Sipola, Board of County Commissioners, Weld County and Steve Reams
Case Number: 1:2022cv03143
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
February 3, 2023 Filing 37 BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
January 31, 2023 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa McMullen, Jennifer Bauder. Erica Alcaraz waiver sent on 1/27/2023, answer due 3/28/2023; Teresa Sipola waiver sent on 1/27/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(Holland-Edwards, Anna)
January 23, 2023 Filing 35 Party Turn Key Health Medical Colorado, PLLC, Turn Key Health Clinicians, PLLC and Turn Key Health Clinics Colorado, LLC terminated pursuant to the #34 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party filed in this case on 01/23/2023. Text Only Entry (athom, )
January 23, 2023 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Turn Key Health Clinicians, PLLC; Turn Key Health Clinics Colorado, LLC and Turn Key Health Medical Colorado, PLLC by Plaintiffs Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullen. (Holland-Edwards, Anna)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 20 January 2023. (cmadr, )
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 20 January 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information (Dkt. #29 ) is GRANTED. The proposed Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information (Dkt. #29-1) is APPROVED and made an Order of Court. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #29 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information filed by Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullen. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/20/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc6, )
January 20, 2023 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullen. (Kennedy, Rachel)
January 20, 2023 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information by Plaintiffs Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullen. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information)(Holland-Edwards, Anna)
January 20, 2023 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa McMullen, Jennifer Bauder. Kristin Miller waiver sent on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/19/2023; Beatriz Ortiz waiver sent on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/19/2023. (Holland-Edwards, Anna)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 20 January 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference (Dkt. #23 ) is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for March 29, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to April 4, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. The proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before March 28, 2023. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearings, the parties shall call the conference line (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# to participate. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 20, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #23 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullen. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/20/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/20/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
January 19, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-03143-DDD. (athom, )
January 19, 2023 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullen. (Holland-Edwards, Anna)
January 19, 2023 Filing 22 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #21 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-03143-REB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 19, 2023 Filing 21 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullen All parties do not consent.. (Holland-Edwards, Anna)
January 18, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Hegarty on behalf of Board of County Commissioners, Weld County, Steve ReamsAttorney Matthew Joseph Hegarty added to party Board of County Commissioners, Weld County(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Joseph Hegarty added to party Steve Reams(pty:dft) (Hegarty, Matthew)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4 January 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Turn Key Entities Defendants to File Their Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #18 ) is GRANTED. The moving Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) on or before January 24, 2023. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 4, 2023 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Turn Key Health Clinicians, PLLC, Turn Key Health Clinics Colorado, LLC, Turn Key Health Medical Colorado, PLLC. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
January 3, 2023 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #14 Brief in Support of Motion filed by attorney Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy F. Campbell. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 15 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
December 30, 2022 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 30, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy F. Campbell on behalf of Turn Key Health Clinics, LLCAttorney Timothy F. Campbell added to party Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC(pty:dft) (Campbell, Timothy)
December 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy on behalf of Turn Key Health Clinics, LLCAttorney Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy added to party Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC(pty:dft) (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 14, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa McMullen, Jennifer Bauder. Board of County Commissioners, Weld County waiver sent on 12/13/2022, answer due 2/11/2023; Steve Reams waiver sent on 12/13/2022, answer due 2/11/2023. (Holland-Edwards, Anna)
December 13, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa McMullen, Jennifer Bauder. Turn Key Health Clinicians, PLLC served on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/3/2023; Turn Key Health Clinics Colorado, LLC served on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/3/2023; Turn Key Health Medical Colorado, PLLC served on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Holland-Edwards, Anna)
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa McMullen, Jennifer Bauder. Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC served on 12/9/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. (Holland-Edwards, Anna)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Claire Kennedy on behalf of Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullenAttorney Rachel Claire Kennedy added to party Jennifer Bauder(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel Claire Kennedy added to party Lisa McMullen(pty:pla) (Kennedy, Rachel)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erica Tick Grossman on behalf of Jennifer Bauder, Lisa McMullenAttorney Erica Tick Grossman added to party Jennifer Bauder(pty:pla), Attorney Erica Tick Grossman added to party Lisa McMullen(pty:pla) (Grossman, Erica)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6 December 2022. Consent Form due by 3/15/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/22/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons) (blaws)
December 6, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
December 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Erica Alcaraz, Board of County Commissioners, Weld County, Kristin Miller, Beatriz Ortiz, Steve Reams, Teresa Sipola, Turn Key Health Clinicians, PLLC, Turn Key Health Clinics Colorado, LLC, Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC, Turn Key Health Medical Colorado, PLLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8812653)Attorney Anna C. Holland-Edwards added to party K. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Anna C. Holland-Edwards added to party R. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Anna C. Holland-Edwards added to party V. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Anna C. Holland-Edwards added to party The Estate of Amy Lynn Cross(pty:pla), filed by R. C., V. C., K. C., The Estate of Amy Lynn Cross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Holland-Edwards, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Amy Lynn Cross et al v. Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bauder
Represented By: Anna C. Holland-Edwards
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Represented By: Rachel Claire Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McMullen
Represented By: Anna C. Holland-Edwards
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Represented By: Rachel Claire Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Represented By: Timothy F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinicians, PLLC
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics Colorado, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Medical Colorado, PLLC
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Alcaraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatriz Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Sipola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners, Weld County
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Hegarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Reams
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Hegarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?