USA v. $16,300.00 in United States currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $16,300.00 in United States currency
Case Number: 1:2022cv03193
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (athom, )
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/21/2022. (athom, )
December 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Bohn, Kurt)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a)and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a SchedulingOrder that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders asappropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, furtherthat the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of JudgeBlackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred,subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referredas defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. Onthe recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the partiesby motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, asettlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/13/2022. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
December 9, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jcharl, )
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $16,300.00 in United States currency Attorney Kurt J. Bohn added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bohn, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $16,300.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Kurt J. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,300.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?