Myers v. American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Suzanne Myers
Defendant: American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv03222
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/31/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2023. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2023. Video Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell (participant instructions attached). By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 VTC Instructions) (evaug)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Quick, Jordan)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Quick, Jordan)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Quick, Jordan)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Quick, Jordan)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/8/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/20/2022. (evaug)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2022 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. Counsel shall also review and familiarize themselves with the Practice Standards of the Magistrate Judge assigned in the referral role in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/19/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Magistrate Judge Dominguez Braswell, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/19/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Michael Drake on behalf of Suzanne MyersAttorney Christopher Michael Drake added to party Suzanne Myers(pty:pla) (Drake, Christopher)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard Andrew Lane, III on behalf of Suzanne MyersAttorney Richard Andrew Lane, III added to party Suzanne Myers(pty:pla) (Lane, Richard)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick Quinn Hustead on behalf of American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Hustead, Patrick)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Connor Lee Cantrell on behalf of American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Cantrell, Connor)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan M. Quick on behalf of American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Quick, Jordan)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint. By Gregory Robert Werner, District Court Judge, on 12/02/2022. (tgall, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim Or Third Party Complaint and Complaint and Jury Demand upon American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company on 11/15/2022. (tgall, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Suzanne Myers.(tgall, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2022CV31953. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8832147), filed by American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Quick, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Myers
Represented By: Christopher Michael Drake
Represented By: Richard Andrew Lane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Quinn Hustead
Represented By: Connor Lee Cantrell
Represented By: Jordan M. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?