Stanisavljevic v. Travelers Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ljubinka Stanisavljevic
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv03287
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of Defendant's Answer filed by Plaintiff Ljubinka Stanisavljevic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Dec 28, 2021 Email from MAC Legal)(Nichols, Ryan)
February 10, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of Defendant's Answer filed by Defendant Travelers Insurance Company. (Lidbury, Hayleigh)
January 20, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of Defendant's Answer by Plaintiff Ljubinka Stanisavljevic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fairplay PD Report, #2 Exhibit 2- Travelers Policy)(Nichols, Ryan)
January 4, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Insurance Company. (Lidbury, Hayleigh)
January 3, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Additional Attachments by Defendant Travelers Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G to Notice of Additional Attachments to Notice of Removal (State Court Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit H to Notice of Additional Attachments to Notice of Removal (State Court Amended Complaint Summons))(Lidbury, Hayleigh)
January 3, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew W. Hall on behalf of Ljubinka StanisavljevicAttorney Matthew W. Hall added to party Ljubinka Stanisavljevic(pty:pla) (Hall, Matthew)
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Earl Nichols on behalf of Ljubinka StanisavljevicAttorney Ryan Earl Nichols added to party Ljubinka Stanisavljevic(pty:pla) (Nichols, Ryan)
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc R. Levy on behalf of Ljubinka StanisavljevicAttorney Marc R. Levy added to party Ljubinka Stanisavljevic(pty:pla) (Levy, Marc)
December 30, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Travelers Insurance Company.(Lidbury, Hayleigh)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Daniel Stine on behalf of Ljubinka StanisavljevicAttorney Jonathan Daniel Stine added to party Ljubinka Stanisavljevic(pty:pla) (Stine, Jonathan)
December 23, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #9 Order to Jonathan D. Stine, The Paul Wilkinson Law Firm, LLC, 999 Jasmine Street, Denver, Colorado 80202. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 3/29/2023. The Scheduling Conference is set for 4/12/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on December 23, 2022. (rvill, )
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Amended Complaint upon The Standard Fire Insurance Company on 11/30/2022. (blaws)
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Insurance Company filed by Ljubinka Stanisavljevic. (blaws)
December 21, 2022 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
December 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lori Kathryn Bell on behalf of The Standard Fire Insurance CompanyAttorney Lori Kathryn Bell added to party The Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Bell, Lori)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet Ex 1 State Court Docket Sheet)(Lidbury, Hayleigh)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Standard Fire Insurance Company from District Court for the City and County of Denver, Case Number 2022CV33212. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8844602), filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Voters Registration, #4 Exhibit Ex C - CO Secretary of State Summary, #5 Exhibit Ex D - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Ex E - Affidavit of Service)(Lidbury, Hayleigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanisavljevic v. Travelers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ljubinka Stanisavljevic
Represented By: Marc R. Levy
Represented By: Matthew W. Hall
Represented By: Ryan Earl Nichols
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Hayleigh P. Lidbury
Represented By: Lori Kathryn Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?