Roberts v. Naph Care et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Richard Roberts
Defendant: Naph Care and Mesa County Detention Facility
Case Number: 1:2023cv01041
Filed: April 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #15 Clerk's Judgment, #14 Order on Report and Recommendations. Addressed to Shawn Richard Roberts. (schap, )
July 6, 2023 Filing 15 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #14 Order on 7/6/2023. (sdunb, )
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the #10 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted and adopted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the #1 Prisoner Complaint and the action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the pleading requirements of Rule 8. It is FURTHER ORDERED that IFP on appeal is denied. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/6/2023.(sdunb, )
June 22, 2023 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #8 Minute Order. Addressed to Shawn Richard Roberts. (sdunb, )
June 22, 2023 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Addressed to Shawn Richard Roberts. (sdunb, )
June 20, 2023 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #10 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Addressed to Shawn Richard Roberts. (sdunb, )
June 9, 2023 Filing 10 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Shawn Richard Roberts. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) and the action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to comply with the pleading requirements of Rule 8. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/09/2023. (athom, )
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 06/09/2023. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01041-LTB-KLM. (athom, ) Modified on 6/9/2023 to correct text (athom, ).
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/08/2023. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. (athom, )
May 18, 2023 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Order, Addressed to Shawn Richard Roberts. (sdunb, )
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Addressed to Shawn Richard Roberts. (sdunb, )
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within 30 days from the date of this Order, an amended complaint on the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this order, a blank copy of the following form: Prisoner Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/2/2023. [Form mailed as Ordered] (sdunb, )
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/28/2023. [Copy mailed to Inmate Accounts] (sdunb, )
April 24, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Shawn Richard Roberts. (jcharl, )
April 24, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
April 24, 2023 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Mesa County Detention Facility, Naph Care, filed by Shawn Richard Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jcharl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Naph Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Richard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naph Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?