Rocky Mountain Gun Owners et al v. Polis
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Tate Mosgrove and Adrian S Pineda
Defendant: Jared S. Polis
Case Number: 1:2023cv01077
Filed: April 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/26/2023 re: #26 defendant's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a response to #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction that shall not exceed 25 pages, and plaintiffs may file a reply in support of their motion that shall not exceed 15 pages. Text Only Entry(pabsec, )
June 23, 2023 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Jared S. Polis. (Worthington, Matthew)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/22/2023. Defendant shall respond to plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. #12 ] on or before June 29, 2023. Plaintiffs may file a reply in support of their motion on or before July 13, 2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order of Transfer. This case is closely related to Case No. 23-cv-01076-PAB, with one of the same plaintiffs and the same defendant in each case and common questions of fact and/or law. Clerk shall transfer this case to Chief Judge Brimmer. All future pleadings shall be designated as 23-cv-01077-PAB. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 6/21/2023. (angar, )
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Tate Mosgrove to Appear Electronically at July 6 Hearing. Plaintiff Tate Mosgrove is allowed to appear electronically for the Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on July 6, 2023, beginning at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs' counsel and Mr. Mosgrove are directed to contact my Courtroom Deputy via email (Bernique_Abiakam@cod.uscourts.gov) for instructions on how to proceed with the VTC. Please contact Ms. Abiakam on or before June 30, 2023. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 6/13/2023. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER. In light of the reassignment of this case to Senior District Judge John L. Kane [#15], the Scheduling Conference set for August 28, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on June 13, 2023. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
June 13, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Allow Mosgrove to Appear Electronically at July 6 Hearing 17 Minute Order,, by Plaintiffs Tate Mosgrove, Adrian S Pineda, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners. (Arrington, Barry)
June 12, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew John Worthington on behalf of Jared S. PolisAttorney Matthew John Worthington added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft) (Worthington, Matthew)
June 12, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of Jared S. PolisAttorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft) (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
June 12, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grant T. Sullivan on behalf of Jared S. PolisAttorney Grant T. Sullivan added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft) (Sullivan, Grant)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. An Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 is set for July 6, 2023, beginning at 9:30 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to file their Witness and Exhibit Lists for the hearing on or before June 29, 2023. Counsel and the parties are expected to attend the hearing in person. The parties shall note on their Witness Lists whether it is anticipated any witness will testify via video teleconferencing. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 6/12/2023. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant is DIRECTED to file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 on or before June 22, 2023. Any Reply is due on or before June 28, 2023. The parties are DIRECTED to call chambers JOINTLY at (303) 844-6118 to set a date and time for the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court has availability on June 29th, July 5th, or July 6th for the hearing. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to provide notice of this Order to Defendant without delay. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 6/9/2023. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
June 9, 2023 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01077-JLK. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on June 8, 2023. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. This case was assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). Although a signed Consent/Non-Consent Form has not yet been filed, Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 . See D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(2)(a) (discussing assignment of cases in which a motion for injunctive relief has been filed). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (csarr, )
June 8, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adrian S Pineda, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Tate Mosgrove. Jared S. Polis waiver sent on 6/7/2023, answer due 8/6/2023. (Arrington, Barry)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Tate Mosgrove, Adrian S Pineda, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(Arrington, Barry)
June 2, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (alave, )
May 31, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jared S. Polis re #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Tate Mosgrove, Adrian S Pineda, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners. (Arrington, Barry)
May 26, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jared S. Polis Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Adrian S Pineda(pty:pla), filed by Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Tate Mosgrove, Adrian S Pineda.(Arrington, Barry)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/09/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion #3 is GRANTED. The Complaint #2 , which Plaintiffs state was inadvertently filed shall be deemed WITHDRAWN. The correct Complaint in this case is #1 in the docket.(alave, )
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/08/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/21/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/28/2023 11:10 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
April 28, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
April 28, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
April 28, 2023 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
April 28, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #2 Complaint by Plaintiffs Tate Mosgrove, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners. (Arrington, Barry)
April 28, 2023 Filing 2 WITHDRAWN COMPLAINT against Jared S. Polis (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9072445), filed by Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Tate Mosgrove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Arrington, Barry) Modified on 5/10/2023 pursuant to Minute Order #8 . (alave, ).
April 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jared S. Polis (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9072435)Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Tate Mosgrove(pty:pla), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Rocky Mountain Gun Owners(pty:pla), filed by Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Tate Mosgrove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Arrington, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Gun Owners et al v. Polis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Gun Owners
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tate Mosgrove
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian S Pineda
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared S. Polis
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Represented By: Matthew John Worthington
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?