GS Holistic, LLC v. Mellowyellow LLC et al
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Defendant: Mellowyellow LLC doing business as Mellow yellow and Yash Kapoor
Case Number: 1:2023cv01940
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
2 Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AFTER SHOW CAUSE HEARING. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on September 27, 2023. (rvill, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/26/2023. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
September 22, 2023 Filing 22 DECLARATION of of Chris Folkerts by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Ticktin, Peter)
September 22, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Additional Counsel Peter Ticktin by Peter David Ticktin on behalf of GS Holistic, LLCAttorney Peter David Ticktin added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla) (Ticktin, Peter)
September 21, 2023 Filing 20 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Peter Ticktin. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). REFILE THE DOCUMENT, Using the correct Event Type "Notice of Entry of Appearance" Further, The filer must affix a complete electronic s/signature to the pleading as well as a complete and updated address block. (norlin, )
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER. This case is set for a Show Cause Hearing on September 26, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. Only Plaintiff's counsel and business representative are required to attend in person. Other interested parties and individuals may listen to and/or participate in the hearing by calling the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# five minutes prior to the scheduled time. There is to be no recording of the proceedings; however, a transcript can be ordered after the fact. If the court learns that any recordings have been made, the recording party may be subject to contempt of court. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on September 21, 2023. Text Only Entry (rvill, )
September 19, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel Peter Ticktin by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC (Ticktin, Peter)
September 8, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Gilbertson, Christina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 16 VACATED - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mellowyellow LLC, Yash Kapoor re #15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to , by Clerk. Text Only Entry (angar, ) Modified to Vacate pursuant to #24 Order on 9/28/2023 (rvill, ).
September 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gilbertson, Christina)
September 6, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Mellowyellow LLC served on 8/4/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Gilbertson, Christina)
August 24, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Yash Kapoor served on 8/4/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Gilbertson, Christina)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 August 2023. Plaintiff's counsel and a business representative of the Plaintiff shall appear in person on September 26, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. to SHOW CAUSE why a general order should not be issued in each of these near-identical trademark/unfair competition cases staying the cases pending submission of verification that Plaintiff or its counsel has engaged in meaningful, in person, negotiation with each defendant and that those efforts at negotiation have failed. (cmadr, )
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. Given the reassignment of this case to District Judge Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Neureiter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for November 2, 2023, before Magistrate Judge Starnella and the October 26, 2023 deadline to file a Proposed Scheduling Order are VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 8/15/2023. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 8/14/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
August 11, 2023 Filing 9 Case Reassigned. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4)(B) and the approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez, and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-01940-RMR-NRN. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella upon her appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Starnella at the beginning of the civil action number (such as 23-cv-01940-KAS). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Starnella in Courtroom C-204. Her chambers are located in Room C-253 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. Her telephone number is 303-335-2770. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3 August 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due10/26/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5-2] is October 19, 2023. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/3/2023. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (norlin, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
July 31, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gilbertson, Christina)
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YASH KAPOOR, MELLOYELLOW LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9222604)Attorney Christina Gilbertson added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla), filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record AO 120 Report, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Gilbertson, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic, LLC v. Mellowyellow LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic, LLC
Represented By: Christina Gilbertson
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellowyellow LLC doing business as Mellow yellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yash Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?