Dr. Water Heater, Inc. v. Dr. Water Heater Inc.
Plaintiff: Dr. Water Heater, Inc.
Defendant: Dr. Water Heater Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02139
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court, having found good cause and in the interest of judicial efficency, ORDERS Defendant to file its answer or other responsive pleading on or before 11/1/2023. The Court further encourages Defendant to familiarize itself with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court's Local Rules, the District Judge's Practice Standards, and the Magistrate Judge's Practice Standards, as the Court notes, e.g., that the parties could have addressed this particular extension request as a stipulation of the parties and that Defendant's counsel fails to state that the Motion was served upon his client. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1. The Court FURTHER ORDERS Defendant's counsel to serve forthwith the Motion and this Order on his client. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/5/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc3)
October 5, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint filed by Dr. Water Heater Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 10/5/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
October 5, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Dr. Water Heater Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Harvey, Larry)
October 3, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Defendant by Larry D. Harvey on behalf of Dr. Water Heater Inc.Attorney Larry D. Harvey added to party Dr. Water Heater Inc.(pty:dft) (Harvey, Larry)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews.The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/29/2023. Text Only Entry (amont, )
September 22, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dr. Water Heater, Inc.. Dr. Water Heater Inc. served on 9/20/2023, answer due 10/11/2023. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 8/24/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
August 23, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (blaws)
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (blaws)
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Trademark by Plaintiff Dr. Water Heater, Inc. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Dr. Water Heater Inc. by Plaintiff Dr. Water Heater, Inc.. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Water Heater Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9259870)Attorney Jeffrey Michael Sturman added to party Dr. Water Heater, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Dr. Water Heater, Inc..(Sturman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. Water Heater, Inc. v. Dr. Water Heater Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Water Heater, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Sturman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Water Heater Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?