Manhead, LLC v. John Does 1-100 et al
Plaintiff: Manhead, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100 and XYZ Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv02191
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Susan Prose
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 10/20/2023. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/20/2023, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 9/15/2023. (schap, )
September 15, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing proceedings held before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 9/15/2023 granting Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order. Court Reporter: Erin Valenti. (dclem)
September 14, 2023 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Patrick Mahoney In Support of a Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order to Issue by Plaintiff Manhead, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) for PI & SO, #2 Exhibit B - Def Bootlgrs, #3 Exhibit C - Infring Merch Seized, #4 Exhibit D - Proofs of Service)(Burns, Cara)
September 1, 2023 Filing 16 RECEIPT for Bond by Plaintiff Manhead, LLC re: #14 Temporary Restraining Order (angar, )
September 1, 2023 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Cara R. Burns Regarding Bond by Plaintiff Manhead, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Burns, Cara)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SEIZURE ORDER; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SEIZURE ORDER SHOULD NOT ISSUE. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 8/31/2023. (schap, )
August 31, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for Show Cause proceeding held before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher granting #4 Motion for TRO. Set Telephone Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Friday September 15, 2023, at 9:00 am in Room 323 (Grand Junction). At the time of the hearing, parties are to call 571-353-2301, Access 435 004 390#. Court Reporter: Erin Valenti. (dclem)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Based upon the Complaint, Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (TRO), Declarations of Patrick Mahoney, the Certificate of Counsel, and good cause being shown: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100, and XYZ Company their true identities being unknown (collectively, Defendants), SHALL SHOW CAUSE before the Honorable Gordon Gallagher United States District Judge, in Courtroom 323 of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, located at Wayne Aspinall U.S. Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue Grand Junction, CO 81501 on Thursday, August 31, 2023, at 1:30pm. The parties may appear remotely and may contact Chambers via email at Gallagher_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov for VTC instructions. If counsel or the parties experience any issues with connectivity, they are to contact Courtroom Deputy Donald Clement at Donald_Clement@cod.uscourts.gov immediately. Parties and counsel should be prepared to address why a TRO and/or nationwide Preliminary Injunction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, the Lanham Act 15 U.S.C. 1051 et. seq., and the All Writs Act, 28 U.S.C. 1651, should not be entered granting to Plaintiff Manhead, LLC, an emergency Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order, and Nationwide Preliminary Injunction to enjoin the Defendants from manufacturing, distributing, selling or holding for sale, any clothing, jewelry, photographs, posters and other merchandise (collectively the Infringing Merchandise) and to seize the same bearing the federally registered trademarks, service marks, likenesses, logos or other indicia of the Artist known as the JELLY ROLL. So ORDERED by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 8/28/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 8/28/2023. Text Only Entry (schap, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. Summons submitted have incomplete caption. (tgall, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 9 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website. (tgall, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 8 Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Cara R. Burns (Actually Certificate of Counsel FRCP Rule 65 & D.C. COLO. LCivR 65.1 AND 7.1(a) ) regarding Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and an Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue #4 by Plaintiff Manhead, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Prior Orders D CO, #2 Exhibit B - Prior Other Orders)(Burns, Cara)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Patrick Mahoney regarding Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and an Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue #4 by Plaintiff Manhead, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tour Dates, #2 Exhibit B - Autho Merch, #3 Exhibit C - Bootleggers, #4 Exhibit D - Examples of Infringing Shirts, #5 Exhibit E - Bootleggers Observed)(Burns, Cara)
August 28, 2023 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support of #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and an Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue filed by Plaintiff Manhead, LLC. (Burns, Cara)
August 28, 2023 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and an Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Plaintiff Manhead, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) for a TRO & SO, #2 Exhibit TRO Info Sheet)(Burns, Cara)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Burns, Cara)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiff Manhead, LLC (Burns, Cara)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Does 1-100, John Does 1-100, XYZ Company (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9266129)Attorney Cara R. Burns added to party Manhead, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Manhead, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons John Doe, #3 Summons Jane Doe, #4 Summons XYZ Co)(Burns, Cara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manhead, LLC v. John Does 1-100 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manhead, LLC
Represented By: Cara R. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?