Phuengngern v. Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private Limited
Plaintiff: Wayakon Phuengngern and Sport Import Company Limited
Defendant: Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private Limited
Case Number: 1:2023cv02201
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended) against Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private Limited Attorney Howard N. Wisnia added to party Sport Import Company Limited(pty:pla), filed by Wayakon Phuengngern, Sport Import Company Limited.(Wisnia, Howard)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Continue. The Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2023 is VACATED and RESET for 11/16/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Telephonic appearances will be permitted. All parties that wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference by telephone may do so by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/9/2023. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/6/2023. Text Only Entry(stvlc4, )
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #11 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference from 10/18/23 to 11/16/23 filed by Wayakon Phuengngern. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/6/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
October 6, 2023 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 10/18/23 to 11/16/23 by Plaintiff Wayakon Phuengngern. (Wisnia, Howard)
September 15, 2023 Filing 10 Utility Resetting Deadlines/Hearings pursuant to ECF #4 : Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2023 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/15/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
September 14, 2023 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02201-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
September 14, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Wayakon Phuengngern All parties do not consent.. (Wisnia, Howard)
September 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Juo on behalf of Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private LimitedAttorney James Juo added to party Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private Limited(pty:dft) (Juo, James)
September 14, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wayakon Phuengngern. Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private Limited waiver sent on 9/11/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Wisnia, Howard)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Consent Form due by 10/4/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak in Courtroom A402 of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. At least 21 days in advance of the scheduling conference, the parties shall meet and attempt to agree upon a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/11/2023. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/30/2023. (trvo, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (blaws)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private Limited (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9267450)Attorney Howard N. Wisnia added to party Wayakon Phuengngern(pty:pla), filed by Wayakon Phuengngern. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wisnia, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phuengngern v. Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayakon Phuengngern
Represented By: Howard N. Wisnia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sport Import Company Limited
Represented By: Howard N. Wisnia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meditech Human Pharmaceuticals Private Limited
Represented By: James Juo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?