Inmate et al (PS) v. Warden
Petitioner: Inmate and Juan Vianez
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2023cv02281
Filed: September 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Susan Prose
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 USCA Case Number 23-1305 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Vianez. (schap, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Vianez to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid, IFP status on appeal denied in final order,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(schap, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Clerk's Judgment, #3 Order Dismissing Case, by Petitioner Juan Vianez. (Attachments: #1 Letter from USCA re: Misdirected NOA)(schap, )
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #3 Order on 9/11/2023. (schap, )
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. It is ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Petitioner has failed to comply with the sanction order entered in Vianez v. United States, No. 14-cv-01363-LTB, ECF No. 7 (D. Colo. Aug. 12, 2014). It is FURTHER ORDERED that IFP on appeal is denied. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/11/2023. (schap, )
September 1, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
September 1, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Inmate, Juan Vianez.(efoga, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inmate et al (PS) v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Inmate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Vianez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?