Gore v. Maestas et al
Plaintiff: William Gore
Defendant: Shae M Maestas, Shae M. (I) Maestas, Verdugo, (I) Verdugo, McMillian, (I) McMillian and City of Pueblo, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2023cv02427
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 16 November 2023. It is ORDERED that the case is stayed pending Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. No. #12 .) Defendants are directed to file a status report, should any part of the case remain, within ten (10) days of a resolution of the Motion to Dismiss.(cmadr, )
November 13, 2023 Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTES for Pre-Scheduling Conference held on 11/13/2023 before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell: Plaintiff fails to appear. The Court will issue an Order to Show Cause. FTR: Courtroom 101. (evaug)
November 9, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Dismiss DIscovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants City of Pueblo, Colorado, Shae M Maestas, Shae M. (I) Maestas, McMillian, (I) McMillian, (I) Verdugo, Verdugo. (Cook, Sara)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Plaintiff['s] Motion for Continuance. The Pre-Scheduling Conference is RESET to November 13, 2023, at 11:00 AM. The parties should refer to the instructions for appearing by video previously provided. (See ECF #10 ) Briefing deadlines are correspondingly amended as follows: Plaintiff's deadline to file a response to Defendants' #12 Motion to Dismiss is extended to November 15, 2023; Defendants shall reply by November 30, 2023. Plaintiff's deadline to file a response to Defendants' #13 Motion for Stay of Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss is extended to November 3, 2023; Defendants shall reply by November 9, 2023. Finally, Plaintiff is advised that the docket indicates all Defendants to this action have been served or have waived service. Accordingly, Defendant is not required to make further attempts at service as he appears to indicate in his Motion. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 10/5/2023. Text Only Entry(mdblc1)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #18 MOTION to Continue filed by William Gore.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/5/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
October 4, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Continuance by Plaintiff William Gore. (cmadr, )
October 3, 2023 Filing 17 Conventionally Submitted Material : One Flash Drive with Exhibits to MOTION to Dismiss #12 by Defendants City of Pueblo, Colorado, Shae M Maestas, Shae M. (I) Maestas, McMillian, (I) McMillian, (I) Verdugo, Verdugo. Location of Stored Items: Box A-1-9. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: The Court intends to address Defendants' #13 Motion for Stay of Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss at the October 11, 2023, Pre-Scheduling Conference. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file his Response to the Motion, if any, on or before October 4, 2023. Defendants shall file their Reply, if any, on or before October 9, 2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 9/26/2023. Text Only Entry (mdblc1)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #11 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. The #12 Motion to Dismiss is accepted as filed. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 9/26/2023. Text Only Entry(mdblc1)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #13 Defendants' MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Dismiss; #12 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss; and #11 Defendants' MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Motion to Dismiss.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/26/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Dismiss DIscovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by Defendants City of Pueblo, Colorado, Shae M Maestas, Shae M. (I) Maestas, McMillian, (I) McMillian, (I) Verdugo, Verdugo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Unreported Cases)(Cook, Sara)
September 25, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants City of Pueblo, Colorado, Shae M Maestas, Shae M. (I) Maestas, McMillian, (I) McMillian, (I) Verdugo, Verdugo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Unreported Cases, #2 Exhibit A-2 Maestas BWC, #3 Exhibit A-3 Verdugo BWC, #4 Exhibit A-4 McMillan BWC)(Cook, Sara)
September 25, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Motion to Dismiss by Defendants City of Pueblo, Colorado, Shae M Maestas, Shae M. (I) Maestas, McMillian, (I) McMillian, (I) Verdugo, Verdugo. (Cook, Sara)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Video Pre-Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2023 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The parties shall participate by video using the attached instructions. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 9/20/2023. Text Only Entry (evaug)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/19/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
September 19, 2023 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 108253 (efoga, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against City of Pueblo, Colorado, Shae M Maestas, Shae M. (I) Maestas, McMillian, (I) McMillian, (I) Verdugo, Verdugo, filed by William Gore.(efoga, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, FEDERAL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET by Defendants City of Pueblo, The, McMillan Jonathan, Shae M Maestas, Keegan Verdugo. (Cook, Sara)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McMillan Jonathan, Shae M Maestas, City of Pueblo, The, Keegan Verdugo from District Court, Pueblo County, Colorado, Case Number 2023CV37., filed by McMillan Jonathan, Shae M Maestas, City of Pueblo, The, Keegan Verdugo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A-3 State Court Plaintiff Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A-4 Entry of Appearance for Defendants in State Court, #5 Exhibit A-5 State Register of Actions)(Cook, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gore v. Maestas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shae M Maestas
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shae M. (I) Maestas
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verdugo
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Verdugo
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMillian
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) McMillian
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pueblo, Colorado
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?