Liner v. New Tech Machinery Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Dylan Liner
Defendant: New Tech Machinery Corp., Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc. and Mazzella New Tech Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv02436
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/28/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by 1/21/2025. In addition to filing, please email the proposed order in editable format to Sweeney_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/16/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja.)
November 16, 2023 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dylan Liner. Mazzella New Tech Corporation served on 11/14/2023., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dylan Liner. Mazzella New Tech Corporation waiver sent on 11/14/2023. (Abbott, Blake)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/15/2023. (morti, )
November 15, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/15/2023. Discovery due by 8/30/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2024. FTR: A402. (morti, )
November 13, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Mazzella New Tech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Pl.'s Amend. Compl., #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Pl.'s Compl., #3 Exhibit Ex. C - SB 86-69, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Gates Corporation Testimony During Senate Hearing, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Letter from Continental Divide Insurance Company to Special Task Force, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Senator Jim Lee Report, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Colorado Municipal League Findings, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - SLP Architects Report, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - CIRSA Letter, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - National Park Service Letter)(Feng, Michael)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss. The Court finds the Motion to Dismiss #8 to be moot in light of the filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint at ECF No. #20 . By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/8/2023. Text Only Entry(cnsja.)
November 8, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mazzella New Tech Corporation, filed by Dylan Liner. [Filed pursuant to the 18 Order] (schap, )
November 8, 2023 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order Parties proposed scheduling order by Plaintiff Dylan Liner. (Abbott, Blake)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #13 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. Pursuant to the Motion and noting that the standards established by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1 appear to be met, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter Dkt. No. [13-1] as the operative Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/8/23. Text Only Entry(stvlc5, )
November 6, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12b6 Response in Opposition to MTD filed by Plaintiff Dylan Liner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Doolittle, Paul)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. The Stipulated Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint (ECF No. #13 ) is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/2/2023. Text Only Entry (cnsja. )
November 1, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mazzella Holding Company, Inc. for Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc., New Tech Machinery Corp.. (Feng, Michael)
November 1, 2023 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02436-CNS. (Text Only Entry) (schap, )
November 1, 2023 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Dylan Liner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Track changes Amended Complaint, #3 Summons)(Abbott, Blake)
November 1, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Abbott, Blake)
November 1, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Dylan Liner All parties do not consent.. (Abbott, Blake)
October 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Dan Feng on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael Dan Feng added to party Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Dan Feng added to party New Tech Machinery Corp.(pty:dft) (Feng, Michael)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 Exhibits in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12b6 by Defendants Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc., New Tech Machinery Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit D to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit E to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit F to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit G to Motion to Dismiss)(Frazier, Michael)
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12b6 by Defendants Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc., New Tech Machinery Corp.. (Frazier, Michael)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul J. Doolittle on behalf of Dylan LinerAttorney Paul J. Doolittle added to party Dylan Liner(pty:pla) (Doolittle, Paul)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dylan Liner. Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc. served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proof of Service)(Abbott, Blake)
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dylan Liner. New Tech Machinery Corp. served on 9/25/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proof of Service)(Abbott, Blake)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Consent Form due by 11/1/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak in Courtroom A402 of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. At least 21 days in advance of the scheduling conference, the parties shall meet and attempt to agree upon a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/8/2023. Because this matter is proceeding on the basis of diversity jurisdiction, each party shall ensure that the disclosure statement required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) has been filed on or before 11/1/2023. Please see attached Order for additional information. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/19/2023. (trvo, )
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc., New Tech Machinery Corp. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9301424)Attorney Blake Garrett Abbott added to party Dylan Liner(pty:pla), filed by Dylan Liner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Abbott, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liner v. New Tech Machinery Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Liner
Represented By: Blake Garrett Abbott
Represented By: Paul J. Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Tech Machinery Corp.
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Represented By: Michael Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Feng
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazzella New Tech Corporation
Represented By: Michael Feng
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?